WA HB2472 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring reasonable terms of payment are available to marijuana retailers when contracting with marijuana processors for the purchase of marijuana products.
Title
Ensuring reasonable terms of payment are available to marijuana retailers when contracting with marijuana processors for the purchase of marijuana products.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
Same As/Similar To
SB6171 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-10 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.