WA HB2461 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Including health in the state transportation system policy goals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Including health in the state transportation system policy goals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-16HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseTR - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM.
2020-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

SB6452 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - First reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback