WA HB2456 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring connectivity for Washington wildlife through safe passages.
Title
Ensuring connectivity for Washington wildlife through safe passages.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Timmons [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6237 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-29 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 84 | 092 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 68 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
77 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
77 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |