WA HB2446 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding long-term noxious weed management on land newly acquired by the fish and wildlife commission.
Title
Regarding long-term noxious weed management on land newly acquired by the fish and wildlife commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Sen. James McCune [R] |
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Brendan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Capital Budget. | |
2010-01-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-19 | AGNR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-19 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. | |
2010-12-09 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2446&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2446.pdf |