WA HB2444 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing leave from employment for participating in a child's educational activities.
Title
Providing leave from employment for participating in a child's educational activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-26 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |