WA HB2443 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the compliance of certain conversion vending units and medical units with certain department of labor and industries requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the compliance of certain conversion vending units and medical units with certain department of labor and industries requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-01HouseEffective date 6/9/2016.
2016-04-01HouseChapter 167, 2016 Laws.
2016-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2016-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2016-03-04SenatePresident signed.
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2016-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2016-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2016-02-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2016-02-25SenateCL - Majority; do pass.
2016-02-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
2016-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
2016-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2016-02-17HousePlaced on third reading.
2016-02-17HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted
2016-02-09HousePlaced on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee.
2016-01-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2016-01-26HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-01-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2016-01-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2016-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback