WA HB2442 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Restructuring three growth management hearings boards into one board.
Title
Restructuring three growth management hearings boards into one board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-04 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-04 | APPG - Majority; do pass LGH 10 bill proposed by Local Government & Housing. | |
2010-02-04 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-04 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2010-01-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-18 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-18 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2010-01-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6214 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2010.