WA HB2440 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administration of the board of tax appeals.
Title
Concerning the administration of the board of tax appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 65; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 03 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 03 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 03 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 03 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 03 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 03 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 03 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |