WA HB2440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning a medical alert designation on driver's licenses and identicards. )
Title
(REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning a medical alert designation on driver's licenses and identicards. )
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |