WA HB2439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making rail investigation and inspection information available to certain state and local governmental entities.
Title
Making rail investigation and inspection information available to certain state and local governmental entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |