WA HB2439 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the relationship between manufacturers and new motor vehicle dealers by providing tools to resolve disparities including expanding compensation for recalled vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the relationship between manufacturers and new motor vehicle dealers by providing tools to resolve disparities including expanding compensation for recalled vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-13HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-26HouseBFS - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM.
2018-01-23HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Business & Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

SB6137 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-23 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM in anticipation of other legislative action.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback