WA HB2439 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing access to adequate and appropriate mental health services for children and youth.
Title
Increasing access to adequate and appropriate mental health services for children and youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 96, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2016-03-08 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6494 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.