WA HB2438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning establishment of the prescription opioid impact account.
Title
Concerning establishment of the prescription opioid impact account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |