WA HB2437 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying employee eligibility for benefits from the public employees' benefits board and conforming the eligibility provisions with federal law.
Title
Clarifying employee eligibility for benefits from the public employees' benefits board and conforming the eligibility provisions with federal law.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-21 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-21 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-21 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB6347 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-22 - First reading, referred to Health Care.