WA HB2428 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Studying students' life-threatening allergic reactions.
Title
Studying students' life-threatening allergic reactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-03 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |