WA HB2419 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding beer, wine, cider, and mead at farmers markets.
Title
Regarding beer, wine, cider, and mead at farmers markets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-29 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-18 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6122 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.