WA HB2417 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning southern resident orca recovery.
Title
Concerning southern resident orca recovery.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-23 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2417&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2417.pdf |