WA HB2415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning access of broadcasters to a geographic area subject to the declaration of a national, state, or local emergency.
Title
Concerning access of broadcasters to a geographic area subject to the declaration of a national, state, or local emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-25 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |