WA HB2409 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Delaying the use of existing tax preferences by the marijuana industry to ensure a regulated and safe transition to the controlled and legal marijuana market in Washington.
Title
Delaying the use of existing tax preferences by the marijuana industry to ensure a regulated and safe transition to the controlled and legal marijuana market in Washington.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2409&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2409.pdf |