WA HB2408 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Mitigating barriers to patient access to care resulting from health insurance contracting practices.
Title
Mitigating barriers to patient access to care resulting from health insurance contracting practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-01-29 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB6266 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.