WA HB2401 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of artificial intelligence in job applications.
Title
Concerning the use of artificial intelligence in job applications.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-01-14 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |