WA HB2401 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning suspension of the evaluation, detention, and commitment of persons with a substance use disorder when secure detoxification facility beds are not available.
Title
Concerning suspension of the evaluation, detention, and commitment of persons with a substance use disorder when secure detoxification facility beds are not available.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6365 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2401&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2401.pdf |