WA HB2400 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mentoring and service learning opportunities in education.
Title
Concerning mentoring and service learning opportunities in education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | HE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |