WA HB2394 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the parent to parent program for individuals with developmental disabilities.
Title
Creating the parent to parent program for individuals with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Chapter 92, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-01-22 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6329 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-01 - Governor vetoed.