WA HB2387 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mandatory election audits of ballot counting equipment.
Title
Concerning mandatory election audits of ballot counting equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-23 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |