WA HB2386 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating Washington's shoreline as a state maritime heritage area.
Title
Designating Washington's shoreline as a state maritime heritage area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB6246 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.