WA HB2381 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain adult family homes to increase capacity to eight beds.
Title
Allowing certain adult family homes to increase capacity to eight beds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-23 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6372 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-15 - First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.