WA HB2377 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating certain postsecondary institutions' eligibility for state financial aid programs.
Title
Eliminating certain postsecondary institutions' eligibility for state financial aid programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |