WA HB2374 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making nonsubstantive changes to procurement law.
Title
Making nonsubstantive changes to procurement law.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | GOE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-22 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |