WA HB2373 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the requirements for collector vehicle registrations.
Title
Modifying the requirements for collector vehicle registrations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6156 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2373&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2373.pdf |