WA HB2372 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the issuance of identicards to individuals released from certain juvenile rehabilitation facilities.
Title
Concerning the issuance of identicards to individuals released from certain juvenile rehabilitation facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-19 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6114 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2372&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2372.pdf |