WA HB2368 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making technical corrections and removing obsolete language from the Revised Code of Washington pursuant to RCW 1.08.025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making technical corrections and removing obsolete language from the Revised Code of Washington pursuant to RCW 1.08.025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-09HouseChapter 22, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-09HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2018-02-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-22SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2018-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-24HouseJUDI - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2018-01-03HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback