WA HB2368 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a surcharge for local homeless housing and assistance.
Title
Concerning a surcharge for local homeless housing and assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass CDHT 14 bill proposed by Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-28 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-28 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB6313 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.