WA HB2363 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing remedies for violations of biometric data ownership rights.
Title
Providing remedies for violations of biometric data ownership rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | ITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |