WA HB2362 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning crime committed by business entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning crime committed by business entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2018-02-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-08HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-08House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-25HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-25HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-18HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2018-01-03HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback