WA HB2356 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing barriers to professional licensure for individuals with previous criminal convictions.
Title
Reducing barriers to professional licensure for individuals with previous criminal convictions.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] |
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |