WA HB2351 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the practice of out-of-state health care professionals volunteering in Washington.
Title
Concerning the practice of out-of-state health care professionals volunteering in Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-28 | House | Chapter 126, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-23 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB6462 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-27 - First reading, referred to Health Care.