WA HB2345 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a higher education registration priority for eligible veterans and national guard members.
Title
Creating a higher education registration priority for eligible veterans and national guard members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-26 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-11 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6288 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2345&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2345.pdf |