WA HB2342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning the timing of comprehensive plan updates required by the growth management act with the timing of shoreline master program updates required by the shoreline management act.
Title
Aligning the timing of comprehensive plan updates required by the growth management act with the timing of shoreline master program updates required by the shoreline management act.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 113, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 78; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |