WA HB2336 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-17)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Assessing the suitability of lands in Washington for agricultural and renewable energy purposes.
Title
Assessing the suitability of lands in Washington for agricultural and renewable energy purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2024-01-24 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |