WA HB2334 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating the use of cannabinoid additives in marijuana products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating the use of cannabinoid additives in marijuana products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseEffective date 6/7/2018*.
2018-03-21HouseChapter 132, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-21HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-03-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-03-07SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-03-07SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-03-07SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2018-03-07SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2018-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-06HouseFloor amendment
2018-03-06House2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-02-12HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-18HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-15HouseCOG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming
2017-12-28HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2334&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2334.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2334-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2334-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2334-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2334-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2334-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=2334&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=2334&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2018

Bill Comments

feedback