WA HB2331 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certified payroll records on public works projects.
Title
Concerning certified payroll records on public works projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPH - Majority; do pass LWD 14 bill proposed by Labor & Workforce Development. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Health & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health & Human Services. |
2014-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-24 | House | LWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-24 | House | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development |