WA HB2326 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning medicaid fraud false claims civil penalties.
Title
Concerning medicaid fraud false claims civil penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-23 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-12-26 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6053 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2326&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2326.pdf |