WA HB2325 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-12 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-12 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the prescription drug monitoring program.
Title
Concerning the prescription drug monitoring program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2017-12-26 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6028 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2325&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2325.pdf |