WA HB2321 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the insurer corporate governance annual disclosure model act.
Title
Addressing the insurer corporate governance annual disclosure model act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-16 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2017-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6059 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-09 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2321&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2321.pdf |