WA HB2320 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring training on human trafficking.
Title
Requiring training on human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to House Rules 3. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate adheres to its position. |
2020-03-10 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-28 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6356 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.