WA HB2320 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a work group to study and make recommendations on natural disaster mitigation and resiliency activities.
Title
Concerning the creation of a work group to study and make recommendations on natural disaster mitigation and resiliency activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 9:15 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2018-01-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-29 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-16 | House | CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2017-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6036 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.