WA HB2318 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Advancing criminal investigatory practices.
Title
Advancing criminal investigatory practices.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 26, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |