WA HB2314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning drug offender sentencing alternatives for offenders convicted of driving or control of a vehicle while under the influence.
Title
Concerning drug offender sentencing alternatives for offenders convicted of driving or control of a vehicle while under the influence.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-23 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6160 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.