WA HB2313 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting maintenance of certification as a condition for a physician to participate in a health carrier's provider network.
Title
Prohibiting maintenance of certification as a condition for a physician to participate in a health carrier's provider network.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2313&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2313.pdf |